SC H3087 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Include, As A Requirement, Registering As A Member Of The Party And To Provide A Procedure For Changing Political Party Affiliation Or Nonaffiliation After A Selection Has Been Made.
Title
Voter registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers |
2015-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hamilton, Henderson, Nanney, Bedingfield, Putnam |
2015-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy |
2015-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0351 (Similar To) 2015-05-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Scott, Young
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 5 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 9 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3087&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3087_20141211.htm |