SC S0310 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 7-5-145 So As To Provide That An Individual Who Is Qualified To Register To Vote May Register In Person And Then Immediately Vote At An In-person Absentee Voting Location In The Person's County Of Residence During The Period For In-person Absentee Voting Established Pursuant To This Act, And To Establish Procedures For Same Day Registration And Voting At In-person Absentee Voting Locations; And By Adding Section 7-15-325 So As To Establish A Thirty-day Period During Which All Qualified Electors Of This State Must Be Allowed To Cast An In-person Absentee Ballot Without Being Required To Assert, State, Offer, Or Provide An Excuse, Justification, Or Reason, And To Specify The Days And Hours That The In-person Absentee Voting Locations Established Pursuant To This Act Must Be Open.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballot

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3207 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
H3268 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3519 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3822 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
715325(n/a)See Bill Text
75145(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback