SC S0297 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
By Adding Section 56-1-222 To Expand Vision Standards And Training Requirements To Allow Certain Persons Who Wear Bioptic Telescopic Lenses For Vision Assistance To Obtain A Driver's License.
Title
Vision requirements for driver's license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2013-02-20 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |