SC S0271 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Act No. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-65-20, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions Of The Textile Communities Revitalization Act, So As To Include Certain Properties Within The Definition Of "contiguous Parcel"; And To Extend The Provisions Of The South Carolina Abandoned Buildings Revitalization Act, As Contained In Chapter 67, Title 12 Of The 1976 Code, Until December 31, 2025. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Abandoned Buildings Revitalization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28 Act No. 21
2021-04-28 Effective date 04/26/21
2021-04-26 Signed By Governor
2021-04-22 Ratified R 30
2021-04-15HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-04-14HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2021-04-14HouseRead second time
2021-04-13HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-14-21
2021-04-06HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 4-13-21
2021-03-19 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2021-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-09SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
2021-02-09SenateRead second time
2021-02-09SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-02-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
126520(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback