SC S0264 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 28, Title 44 So As To Provide For The Establishment Of The "disabled Self-employment Development Trust Fund" To Provide Assistance To Individuals With Disabilities To Pursue Entrepreneurship And Self-employment Opportunities, By Providing Business Development Grants For The Startup, Expansion, Or Acquisition Of A Business Operated Within The State; By Adding Section 12-6-3760 So As To Provide For A Tax Credit For Taxpayer Contributions To The Fund; And To Amend Section 12-6-5060, As Amended, Relating To Tax Returns, So As To Add The Fund To The List Of Funds To Which A Taxpayer May Contribute On A State Individual Tax Return.
Title
Disabled Self-Employment Development Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3513 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White