SC H3513 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 28, Title 44 So As To Provide For The Establishment Of The "south Carolinians With Disabilities Economic Development Trust Fund" To Provide Assistance To Individuals With Disabilities To Pursue Entrepreneurship And Self-employment Opportunities Through Business Development Grants For The Startup, Expansion, Or Acquisition Of A Business Operated Within The State; By Adding Section 12-6-3760 So As To Provide For A Tax Credit For Taxpayer Contributions To The Fund; And To Amend Section 12-6-5060, As Amended, Relating To Tax Returns, So As To Add The Fund To The List Of Funds To Which A Taxpayer May Contribute On A State Individual Tax Return.
Title
South Carolinians with Disabilities Economic Development Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0264 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3513&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3513_20201216.htm |