SC S0234 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 9-1-1085 And 9-11-225 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Employer And Employee Contribution Rates Under The South Carolina Retirement System And The Police Officers Retirement System Respectively, To Provide That An Employer, Up To Certain Limits, May Elect To Pay All Or A Portion Of Required Employee Contributions During A Fiscal Year.
Title
Employer and employee contribution rates under SCRS and PORS
Sponsors
Sen. Ross Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3106 (Similar To) 2022-05-11 - Read second time
S0616 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0616 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0234&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/234_20201209.htm |