SC H3106 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 9-1-1085 And 9-11-225, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Both Relating To Employer And Employee Contribution Rates Under The South Carolina Retirement System And The Police Officers Retirement System Respectively, So As To Provide That An Employer, Up To Certain Limits, May Elect To Pay All Or A Portion Of Required Employee Contributions During A Fiscal Year.
Title
Employer and employee contribution rates under SCRS and PORS
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Bannister [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. Chandra Dillard [D] | Rep. Jason Elliott [R] |
Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Mark Willis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2022-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-06 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2022-04-05 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0234 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0616 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0616 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Finance