SC S0227 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 11:00 am in Blatt Room 521
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Allow A Municipality Without An Operating Millage On January 1, 2019, Or A Municipality That Incorporates After January 1, 2019, To Impose An Operating Millage And To Impose Limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Millage rate increase limitations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-01-24SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-23SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-3
2019-01-23SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-01-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0113 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3168 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
H3457 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-7

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback