SC S0113 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 6-1-320(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Millage Rate Increase Limitations, To Create A New Item Allowing Municipalities Without An Operating Millage On January 1, 2018, Or Municipalities That Incorporate After January 1, 2018, To Impose An Operating Millage And To Impose Limitations.
Title
Millage rate increase limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0227 (Similar To) 2020-09-22 - Debate adjourned until Wed. 9-23-20
H3168 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
H3457 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
H3168 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
H3457 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0113&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/113_20181212.htm |