SC S0215 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Conduct Of Elections, By Amending Sections 7-13-35 And 7-13-190, To Provide That An Election Shall Be Postponed If The Governor Declares A State Of Emergency For An Entire Jurisdiction Holding An Election, That The Postponed Election Shall Be Held On The First Tuesday Following The Original Election Date, And That This Provision Does Not Apply To Statewide Primaries Or General Elections Unless The Declaration Covers The Entire State; To Amend Section 7-13-350 To Change The Date That Candidates For President And Vice-president Must Be Certified To The First Tuesday Following The First Monday In September; To Amend Section 5-15-100 Relating To Municipal Elections, To Provide That Managers Of An Election Shall Certify The Results Within Two Days Of The Election; To Amend Sections 7-17-10 And 7-17-20, To Provide That The Commissioners Of Election For Statewide Officers, Solicitors, Members Of The General Assembly, And County Officers Must Meet On The Monday Following An Election To Organize As The County Board Of Canvassers And To Require That They Submit Their Results To The State Board Of Canvassers By Noon On The Tuesday Following The Election; To Amend Article 1, Chapter 17, Title 7 By Adding Section 7-17-25 To Provide That Post Election Audits Are To Be Completed By County Boards Of Registration And Election Prior To Certification And To Require That Enabling Regulations Are To Provide That The Audit Data And Results Are To Be Open To The Public; To Amend Section 7-11-15 Relating To The Filing Of The Statement Of Intention Of Candidacy And Party Pledge, To Reduce The Number Of Signed Copies That Must Be Filed With The Election Commission From Three To One; And To Amend Section 7-11-80 To Provide For An Alternate Paper Size For Nominating Petitions For Candidacy Or Political Party Certification.
Title
Conduct of elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Scott, Young |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 15 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 11 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 11 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 190 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 17 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 17 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 17 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |