SC S0210 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-17 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hembree, McElveen, Young, Sabb
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Freedom Of Religion For Student Associations, To Provide That No Public Institution Of Higher Learning Shall Take Any Action Or Enforce Any Policy That Denies A Religious Student Association Any Benefit Available To Any Other Student Association Based On The Religious Student Association's Requirement That Its Leaders Or Members Adhere To Its Sincerely Held Religious Beliefs Or Standards Of Conduct; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Association Freedom of Religion Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-17SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hembree, McElveen, Young, Sabb
2015-04-01SenateCommitted to Committee on Judiciary
2015-04-01SenateRecalled from Committee on Education
2015-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced and read first time
2014-12-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2014-12-10SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback