SC S0199 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Speeding In Work Zones And Penalties Associated With Speeding In Work Zones, To Delete This Provision And Create "peanut's Law", To Provide A Definition For The Terms "highway Work Zone" And "highway Worker", To Create The Offenses Of "endangerment Of A Highway Worker", And To Provide Penalties For These Offenses; To Amend Section 56-1-720, Relating To The Point System Established For The Evaluation Of The Driving Record Of Persons Operating Motor Vehicles, To Provide That "endangerment Of A Highway Worker" Violations Range Between Two And Six Points; And To Repeal Section 56-5-1536 Relating To Driving In Temporary Work Zones And Penalties For Unlawful Driving In Temporary Work Zones.
Title
Peanut's Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table The Motion To Carry Over (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 21 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table The Motion To Carry Over (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 21 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-65 Nays-34 |
2015-05-26 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-26 | House | Amended |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-3 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 1535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 1536 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |