SC S0197 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), McLeod, Rice, Senn, Adams
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), McLeod, Rice, Senn, Adams
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 1, Chapter 3, Title 16 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Homicides, By Adding Section 16-3-65, To Create The Offense Of Drug-induced Homicide, To Provide A Penalty For A Violation, And To Prohibit An Affirmative Defense; And To Amend Section 16-1-10(d) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To A List Of Exceptions For Felonies And Misdemeanors, To Add Drug-induced Homicide.
Title
Homicide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), McLeod, Rice, Senn, Adams |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0429 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary