SC S0429 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 1, Chapter 3, Title 16 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Homicide, By Adding Section 16-3-80, To Create The Offense Of Drug-induced Homicide, To Provide A Penalty For A Violation, And To Prohibit An Affirmative Defense; And To Amend Section 16-1-10(d) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To A List Of Exceptions For Felonies And Misdemeanors, To Add Drug-induced Homicide.
Title
Homicide, drug-induced
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), McLeod, Rice, Senn, Adams |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0197 (Similar To) 2022-02-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), McLeod, Rice, Senn, Adams