SC S0194 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 16-15-90 And 16-15-100, Relating To Prostitution, To Increase The Penalties For Solicitation Of Prostitution, Establishing Or Keeping A Brothel Or House Of Prostitution, Or Causing Or Inducing Another To Participate In Prostitution; To Establish The Affirmative Defense Of Being A Victim Of Human Trafficking; And To Increase The Penalties For Soliciting, Causing, Or Inducing Another For Or Into Prostitution When The Prostitute Has A Mental Disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 8 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 100 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number Rfh-3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2020-09-22SenateFree conference report adopted
2020-09-22SenateFree conference committee appointed Hutto, Shealy, Young
2020-09-22SenateFree conference powers granted
2020-09-15HouseConference committee appointed Murphy, Fry, and Bamberg
2020-05-12SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Shealy, Young
2020-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-8 Nays-107
2020-05-12HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2020-03-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-11SenateReturned to House with amendments
2020-03-11SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2020-03-11SenateHouse amendment amended
2020-03-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-10SenateHouse amendment amended
2020-02-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-17HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2020-01-16HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-01-16HouseRoll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
2020-01-16HouseRead second time
2020-01-16HouseAmended
2020-01-15HouseDebate adjourned until Thursday, January 16
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-24SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-01-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0023 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3074 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Wooten
H3296 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1615100(n/a)See Bill Text
161590(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0194&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20181212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20190123.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20190124.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20190124A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20200116.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20200225.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20200310.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20200311.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20200311A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/194_20200312.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15527
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17003
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17630
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17715
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17726
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17919

Bill Comments

feedback