SC S0023 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 16-15-90 And 16-15-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Both Relating To Prostitution Offenses, So As To Increase The Penalties For Solicitation Of Prostitution, Establishing Or Keeping A Brothel Or House Of Prostitution, Or Causing Or Inducing Another To Participate In Prostitution; To Establish The Affirmative Defense When A Victim Of Human Trafficking Is Charged With A Prostitution Offense; To Increase The Penalties For Soliciting, Causing, Or Inducing Another For Or Into Prostitution When The Prostitute Has A Mental Disability; And To Repeal Section 16-15-110 Relating To Prostitution.
Title
Prostitution offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0194 (Similar To) 2020-09-22 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
H3074 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Wooten
H3296 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson
H3074 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Wooten
H3296 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 15 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0023&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/23_20181212.htm |