SC S0192 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 2-19-10, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Judicial Merit Selection Commission And The Commission's Appointment, Qualifications, And Term, So As To Revise The Membership And Terms Of The Commission; To Amend Section 2-19-80, Relating To The Nomination Of Qualified Candidates By The Judicial Merit Selection Commission, So As To Change The Commission's Process For Nominating Judicial Candidates From The Nomination Of Three Qualified Candidates To The Release Of A List Of All Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly; And To Amend Section 2-19-90, Relating To The Election Of Judges By The General Assembly, So As To Require A Majority Vote From Each House Of The General Assembly.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Rex Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3448 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0192&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/192_20201209.htm |