SC H3448 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 2-19-10, As Amended, 2-19-20, 2-19-35, 2-19-70, 2-19-80, And 2-19-90, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To The Judicial Merit Selection Commission, So As To Change The Commission's Process For Nominating Judicial Candidates From The Nomination Of Three Qualified Candidates To The Release Of A List Of All Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2021-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0192 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3448&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3448_20201216.htm |