SC S0185 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 1b Of Act 80 Of 2013, Relating To The High Growth Small Business Job Creation Act Of 2013, Commonly Referred To As The Angel Investor Act, Found In Chapter 44, Title 11, To Extend The Sunset Provision From December 31, 2019, To December 31, 2025.
Title
High Growth Small Business Job Creation Act (Angel Investor Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] | Sen. Rex Rice [R] | Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] | Sen. Shane Martin [R] |
Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3210 (Similar To) 2020-10-02 - Act No. 154