SC H3210 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Reauthorize The Act For An Additional Six Years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High Growth Small Business Job Creation Act (Angel Investor Act), extend sunset provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-3
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, B.Cox, Gagnon, Caskey, Bannister, Willis, Sottile, Stavrinakis, Daning, Blackwell, Taylor, Forrester, Fry, West, Finlay, Simrill, V.S.Moss, Bryant, Bales, D.C.Moss, Erickson, Herbkersman, Whitmire
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, W.Cox, Morgan, Hyde, Stringer
2019-01-29HouseCommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-29HouseRecalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns
2019-01-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0185 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback