SC S0150 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Bill ruled out of order
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "south Carolina Compassionate Care Act"; To Amend Chapter 53, Title 44 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Poisons, Drugs, And Other Controlled Substances, By Adding Article 20, To Provide For The Sale Of Medical Cannabis Products And The Conditions Under Which A Sale Can Occur; To Amend Section 12-36-2120(69) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Exemptions From The South Carolina Sales And Use Tax, To Provide That Cannabis Sold By A Dispensary To A Cardholder Is Exempt From A Certain Sales Tax; To Repeal Article 4, Chapter 53, Title 44 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Controlled Substances Therapeutic Research; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Compassionate Care Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-04 - House - House: Table Appeal Of The Ruling Of The Speaker (Y: 59 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 48 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 66 (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment No. 41 (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Motion For Cloture (Y: 3 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-04HouseBill ruled out of order
2022-04-21HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2022-04-20 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-04-19HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2022-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2022-02-15HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-02-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-02-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2022-02-09SenateRoll call Ayes-28 Nays-15
2022-02-09SenateRead second time
2022-02-09SenateAmended
2022-02-08SenateDebate interrupted
2022-02-08SenateAmended
2022-02-03SenateDebate interrupted
2022-02-02SenateDebate interrupted
2022-02-01SenateDebate interrupted
2022-01-28SenateDebate interrupted
2022-01-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-01-26SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2022-01-20SenateSpecial order, set for January 20, 2022
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3361 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Carter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12362120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0150&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20210331.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220126.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220127.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220208.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220209A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220210.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220419.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/150_20220420.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0150%202021-03-31%20amended.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0150%202022-02-09%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20089
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20090
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20091
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20093
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20873
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21185

Bill Comments

feedback