SC H3361 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Compassionate Care Act" By Adding Article 20 To Chapter 53, Title 44 So As To Provide For The Sale Of Medical Cannabis And The Conditions Under Which A Sale Can Occur; To Define Certain Terms; To Provide For Fees And To Create Criminal Penalties; To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Promulgate Regulations And Submit Reports; To Establish A Medical Cannabis Program Fund And To Provide For Its Purposes; To Establish A Medical Cannabis Advisory Board And To Provide For Its Membership And Duties; And For Other Purposes; To Amend Section 12-36-2120, Relating To Exemptions From The South Carolina Sales And Use Tax, So As To Exempt From Sales Tax Cannabis Sold By A Dispensary To A Cardholder; And To Repeal Article 4, Chapter 53, Title 44 Relating To Controlled Substances Therapeutic Research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Compassionate Care Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
2021-02-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Kimmons, Wetmore, Stavrinakis
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0150 (Similar To) 2021-03-31 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12362120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback