SC S0133 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Conference committee appointed Rice, Campsen, Sabb
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Make Application To The Congress Of The United States To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution Limited To Proposing Amendments That Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government, Limit The Power And Jurisdiction Of The Federal Government, And Limit The Terms Of Office For Its Officials And For Members Of Congress; To Provide Certain Reservations, Understandings, And Declarations Limiting The Application; And To Provide Certain Selection Criteria For Delegates To A Convention Of The States As Well As Limitations Upon Their Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convention of the States

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Waive Rule 32a (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number 2a (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12SenateConference committee appointed Rice, Campsen, Sabb
2022-05-12HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Taylor, Elliott, Wheeler
2022-05-12SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2022-05-12HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2022-05-11HouseRoll call Yeas-67 Nays-41
2022-05-11HouseRead second time
2022-05-11HouseAmended
2022-05-11HouseDebate interrupted
2022-05-11HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2022-05-11HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2022-05-11HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2022-05-10HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2022-05-10HouseAmended
2022-05-05HouseDebate adjourned
2022-05-03HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2022-03-29HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-03-29HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-03-17SenateRead third time and sent to House
2022-03-16SenateRoll call Ayes-24 Nays-16
2022-03-16SenateRead second time
2022-03-15SenateDebate interrupted
2022-03-15SenateAmended
2022-03-10SenateSpecial order, set for March 10, 2022
2022-02-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-02-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2022-02-04SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McLeod, Rice, Garrett, Stephens
2021-04-07SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Young, McLeod, Garrett
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0033 (Similar To) 2022-02-04 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McLeod, Rice, Garrett, Stephens
H3205 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Effective date 04/13/22

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0133&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20220223.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20220224.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20220315.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20220503.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20220510.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/133_20220511.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0133%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0133%202022-05-03%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20556
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20558
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21431
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21433
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21459

Bill Comments

feedback