SC H3205 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Effective date 04/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Make Application To The Congress Of The United States To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution Limited To Proposing Amendments That Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government, Limit The Power And Jurisdiction Of The Federal Government, And Limit The Terms Of Office For Its Officials And For Members Of Congress. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convention of the states

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-29 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Continue (Y: 45 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Invoke The Previous Question (cloture) (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 40 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Table Amendment 11 Amendment Number 11 (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Table Amendment 10 Amendment Number 10 (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Table Amendment 9 Amendment Number 9 (Y: 71 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 56 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 31 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-19 Effective date 04/13/22
2022-04-13 Signed By Governor
2022-04-07 Ratified R 141
2022-03-29HouseRoll call Yeas-64 Nays-48
2022-03-29HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2022-03-10SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2022-03-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-03-09SenateRoll call Ayes-27 Nays-13
2022-03-09SenateRead second time
2022-03-09SenateAmended
2022-03-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-03-08SenateDebate interrupted
2022-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2022-03-03SenateSpecial order, set for March 3, 2022
2022-02-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-02-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2022-02-04SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McLeod, Rice, Garrett, Stephens
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-05-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-05-12HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-05-11HouseRoll call Yeas-66 Nays-42
2021-05-11HouseRead second time
2021-05-11HouseAmended
2021-05-05HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 5-6-21
2021-04-27HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-04-21HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-04-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Kimmons
2021-03-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: T.Moore
2021-03-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
2021-02-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dabney
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
2021-02-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley
2021-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGinnis
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, Brittain
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: May
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0033 (Similar To) 2022-02-04 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McLeod, Rice, Garrett, Stephens
S0133 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Conference committee appointed Rice, Campsen, Sabb

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3205&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20210421.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20210511.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20210512.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20220223.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20220224.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20220308.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20220309.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20220309A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3205_20220310.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/H3205%202021-04-21%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19641
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19643
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19644
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19645
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19647
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19646
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19648
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19650
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19651
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20281
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20643

Bill Comments

feedback