SC S0001 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Debate adjourned
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 16-3-80 So As To Create The Offense Of Drug-induced Homicide, To Provide A Penalty For A Violation, And To Prohibit An Affirmative Defense; By Amending Section 16-1-10, Relating To A List Of Exceptions For Felonies And Misdemeanors, So As To Add Drug-induced Homicide; And By Amending Section 44-53-190, Relating To Schedule I Drugs, So As To Add Fentanyl-related Substances.
Title
Drug-induced homicide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 2 (Y: 14 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 2 (Y: 14 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-05-07 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-05-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Matthews, Rice, Senn, Adams |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0238 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3476 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0586 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder
H3476 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0586 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 190 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |