SC H5369 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, May 25, 2016, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Supreme Court, Chief Justice, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2016, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Expires July 31, 2024; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Supreme Court, Seat 2, Whose Term Expires July 31, 2016; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 5, Chief Judge, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Expires June 30, 2021; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2016; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2016; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 4, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2016; And As The Date To Meet In Joint Session For The Purpose Of Electing A Member To The Sc Public Service Commission, Seat 1, To Fill A Term Which Expires June 30, 2020; To Elect A Member To The Sc Public Service Commission, Seat 3, To Fill A Term Which Expires June 30, 2020; To Elect A Member To The Sc Public Service Commission, Seat 5, To Fill A Term Which Expires June 30, 2020; And To Elect A Member To The Sc Public Service Commission, Seat 7, To Fill A Term Which Expires June 30, 2020.
Title
Judicial elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5369&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/5369_20160518.htm |