SC H5198 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-117-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The University Of South Carolina Board Of Trustees, So As To Revise The Composition Of The Board; To Amend Section 59-117-20, Relating To Terms Of Elected Members Of The Board, So As To Provide For The Election Of New Members Of The Board For Staggered Terms Beginning July 1, 2023; To Amend Section 59-117-40, Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Board, So As To Provide The Board Shall Elect A Chairman, To Provide The Chairman Serves A Two-year Term, To Provide A Trustee May Not Serve More Than Two Terms As Chairman, And To Revise Certain Powers; And To Amend Section 59-117-50, Relating To Meetings Of The Board, So As To Provide For How Special Meetings Of The Board May Be Called.
Title
University of South Carolina Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Debate interrupted by adjournment |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Special order, set for May 10, 2022 |
2022-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-1 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, R.Williams, Jefferson, Cobb-Hunter |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0074 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0813 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4410 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
S1242 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0813 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4410 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
S1242 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 117 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |