SC H5159 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 05/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 05/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, Relating To Standards For Licensing Hospices, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4800, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
Standards for licensing hospices (D. No. 4800)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 280 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-2 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |