SC H5097 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 4-11-290, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Dissolution Of Special Purpose Districts, So As To Allow A Hospital District That Is Undergoing Dissolution To Transfer Its Assets To An Affiliated Organization That Is Exempt From Tax Under Section 501(c)(3) Or (4) Of The Internal Revenue Code Of 1986.
Title
Local Government - Local Planning/Zoning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-07 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-04-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-04-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |