SC H5074 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create The "child Food And Nutrition Services Study Committee" To Develop Recommendations For Transferring Administration Of Certain Federal Child Food And Nutrition Programs In This State To The Department Of Agriculture, To Provide For The Membership Of The Study Committee, To Require The Study Committee Prepare A Report With Findings And Recommendations For The General Assembly, And To Provide For The Dissolution Of The Study Committee.
Title
Child Food and Nutrition Services Study Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Polled out of committee Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-2 |
2022-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |