SC H5022 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, Rose
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, Rose
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 59-63-810 So As To Provide That Eligible Schools That Participate In The School Breakfast Program Shall Provide Breakfast And Lunch Without Charge To All Students And To Provide Guidelines; And By Amending Section 59-10-350, Relating To The Length Of Lunch Periods, So As To Require Schools To Provide Thirty Minute Lunch Periods To All Students.
Title
Free School Meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, Rose |
2024-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bauer, Ott, G.M.Smith |
2024-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton |
2024-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0148 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4982 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H4982 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5022&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/5022_20240201.htm |