SC S0148 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 59-63-810 So As To Provide That Eligible Schools That Participate In The School Breakfast Program Shall Provide Breakfast And Lunch Without Charge To All Students And To Provide Guidelines; And By Amending Section 59-10-350, Relating To The Length Of Lunch Periods, So As To Require Schools To Provide Thirty Minute Lunch Periods To All Students.
Title
Free School Meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4982 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H5022 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, Rose
H5022 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, Rose