SC H5014 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Issuance Of A Uniform Traffic Ticket Alleging The Violation Of A Provision That Relates To The Operation Of A Bus Is Not Subject To The Provisions Contained In This Section
Title
Commercial driver license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 26 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Act No. 274 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/09/14 | |
2014-06-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 310 | |
2014-05-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-70 Nays-20 |
2014-05-29 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-05-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 2100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2770 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2773 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 7 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 7 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |