SC H4968 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Effective date 04/04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Procedure For Filling A Vacancy In The Office Of Pickens County Veterans Affairs Officer; To Designate The Office Of The Pickens County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections As The Polling Location For The Election; To Establish A Voting Period During The Board's Normal Hours Of Operation In Which To Conduct The Election, To Authorize Absentee Voting, And To Specify When The Board Of Voter Registration And Elections Of Pickens County Shall Meet To Certify Results

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Act No. 489, Pickens County Veterans Affairs Officer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 46) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06 Effective date 04/04/18
2018-04-04 Signed By Governor
2018-04-03 Ratified R 159
2018-03-28SenateRead third time and enrolled
2018-03-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-22SenateRead second time
2018-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
2018-03-21HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-03-20HouseRoll call Yeas-70 Nays-0
2018-03-20HouseRead second time
2018-03-20HouseAmended
2018-03-07HouseCommittee report: Favorable Pickens Delegation
2018-02-21HouseReferred to Pickens Delegation
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback