SC H4953 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 25-11-80, Relating To State Veterans' Cemeteries, So As To Remove A Residency Requirement.
Title
State veterans' cemeteries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-1 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart, Williams, Henegan, Caskey, Jefferson, J.Moore, Rivers |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |