SC H4874 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Substitute The Term "department Of Motor Vehicles" For The Term "comptroller General", And To Make Technical Changes.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2016-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4875 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 148 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 171 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 2080 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 746 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 10310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 11450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 12610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 13010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 13310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 13610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 2545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 355 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 3950 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 4800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 5400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 6000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 662 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7050 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7780 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 7950 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 8710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2933 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2942 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 750 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |