SC H4851 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Overpass Located Along Lafayette Drive In The City Of Sumter "schp Patrolman Jimmy A. Traylor Memorial Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain This Designation.
Title
SCHP Patrolman Jimmy A. Traylor Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-04-14 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced |