SC H4795 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Students Eligible For The Award May Elect To Defer Enrollment In An Eligible Four-year Institution For One Year, Until The Fall Term Of The Year Following The Year Of Graduation, Without Declining The Award; And To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act, Regardless Of Its Effective Date, Must Be Construed To Apply To Students Who Graduate In The Spring Of 2016.
Title
Palmetto Fellows Scholarship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-1 |
2016-04-20 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-20 | House | Amended |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |