SC H4773 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-1-375 So As To Enact The "student Identification Card Suicide Prevention Act", To Provide Beginning July 1, 2021, Public Schools And Public And Private Institutions Of Higher Learning Shall Add The Telephone Number For The National Suicide Prevention Lifeline To Student Identification Cards And May Add Telephone And Text Numbers For Certain Other Hotlines To Student Identification Cards, To Provide For The Use Of Student Identification Cards In Existence Before The Effective Date Of This Act, And To Provide For The Applicability Of This Act.
Title
Student Identification Card Suicide Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mandy Norrell [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Neal Collins [R] |
Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R] | Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2020-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, Kimmons, Bernstein |
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled |