SC H4761 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-155-155 So As To Provide The State Board Of Education Shall Approve No More Than Five Reliable And Valid Early Literacy And Numeracy Screening Assessment Instruments For Selection And Use By School Districts For Kindergarten Through Third Grade, And To Provide Requirements For Such Instruments; To Amend Section 59-33-510, Relating To Definitions Concerning The Universal Screening Processes Used In Public School Districts For Students Experiencing Academic Or Social-emotional Difficulties, So As To Provide All Related Screening Tools Must Be Capable Of Identifying Students With Dyslexia Or Other Reading Disorders; To Amend Section 59-155-110, Relating To The Read To Succeed Office, So As To Correct A Typographical Error; To Amend Section 59-155-120, Relating To Definitions In The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 59-155-130, Relating To Duties Of The Read To Succeed Office, So As To Revise The Requirements Concerning Coursework Necessary For Literacy Add-on Endorsements And To Revise Requirements For Professional Development In Reading And Coaching For Certified Reading/literacy Coaches And Literacy Teachers; To Amend Section 59-155-140, Relating To The State Reading Proficiency Program, So As To Remove The Use Of Book Clubs For Certain Required Supplemental Instruction; To Amend Section 59-155-150, Relating To The Readiness Assessment Provided By The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Revise The Requirements For Screening And Diagnostic Assessments And Interventions; To Amend Section 59-155-160, Relating To Mandatory Student Retention Provisions Of The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Revise Criteria For Retention And Exemptions From Retention, To Eliminate An Appeals Process, And To Revise Criteria For Intensive Instructional Services And Support Provided To Retained Students; And To Amend Section 59-155-180, Relating To Provisions Concerning Teacher Education Programs In The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Remove The Requirement That Reading/literacy Coaches Be Employed In All Elementary Schools, To Revise Requirements Concerning The Roles And Functions Of Reading/literacy Coaches, To Provide Measures To Ensure Teacher Candidates Understand The Foundations Of Reading And Are Prepared To Teach Reading To All Students, And To Provide The Commission On Higher Education And The Learning Disorders Task Force Annually Shall Assess The Effectiveness Of Teacher Education Programs In Preparing Teachers To Diagnose Reading Problems In Students And Provide Appropriate Interventions, And To Provide The Commission Shall Report Findings Of This Assessment To The State Department Of Education And To The General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early assessment screenings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-26HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseAmended
2020-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
2020-02-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2020-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Felder
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-12-11HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0419 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3759 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59155110(n/a)See Bill Text
59155120(n/a)See Bill Text
59155130(n/a)See Bill Text
59155140(n/a)See Bill Text
59155150(n/a)See Bill Text
59155155(n/a)See Bill Text
59155160(n/a)See Bill Text
59155180(n/a)See Bill Text
5933510(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback