SC H3759 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-27)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Rules Adopted By These Boards Must Align With Applicable State And Federal Accountability Standards; And To Repeal Article 15 Of Chapter 18, Title 59 Relating To Intervention And Assistance Under The Education Accountability Act And Section 59-59-30 Relating To Implementation Of The South Carolina Education And Economic Development Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Career Opportunity and Access for All

Sponsors

Rep. James Lucas [R]Rep. Merita Allison [R]Rep. Raye Felder [R]Rep. Thomas Pope [R]
Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. Todd Rutherford [D]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Murrell Smith [R]
Rep. Peter McCoy [R]Rep. Davey Hiott [R]Rep. William Sandifer [R]Rep. Gary Clary [R]
Rep. Garry Smith [R]Rep. Christopher Murphy [R]Rep. Bill Taylor [R]Rep. Jerry Govan [D]
Rep. Weston Newton [R]Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D]Rep. Jason Elliott [R]Rep. Brandon Newton [R]
Rep. David Weeks [D]Rep. William Hewitt [R]Rep. William Bailey [R]Rep. William Hixon [R]
Rep. Paula Rawl Calhoon [R]Rep. Linda Bennett [R]Rep. Ronald Young [R]Rep. Mandy Norrell [D]
Rep. Max Hyde [R]Rep. Wallace Jordan [R]Rep. Justin Bamberg [D]Rep. Randy Ligon [R]
Rep. Michael Sottile [R]Rep. William Cogswell [R]Rep. Joseph Daning [R]Sen. Dwight Loftis [R]
Rep. James Burns [R]Rep. William Wheeler [D]Rep. Roger Kirby [D]Rep. Edward Tallon [R]
Rep. Micajah Caskey [R]Rep. John West [R]Rep. Neal Collins [R]Rep. Michael Forrester [R]
Rep. Kit Spires [R]Rep. Anne Thayer [R]Rep. Christopher Wooten [R]Rep. Chip Huggins [R]
Rep. Mark Willis [R]Rep. William Herbkersman [R]Rep. Tommy Stringer [R]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R]Rep. John Mccravy [R]Rep. Phillip Lowe [R]Rep. Alan Clemmons [R]
Rep. Sylleste Davis [R]Rep. Bruce Bannister [R]Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D]Rep. Frank Atkinson [D]
Rep. Bruce Bryant [R]Rep. Jimmy Bales [D]Rep. Terry Alexander [D]Rep. Robert Williams [D]
Rep. Bobby Cox [R]Rep. Richard Martin [R]Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]Rep. Russell Fry [R]
Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D]Rep. William Clyburn [D]Rep. Con Chellis [R]Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R]
Rep. Samuel Rivers [R]Rep. Cally Forrest [R]Rep. Nancy Mace [R]Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R]
Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D]Rep. Chandra Dillard [D]Rep. Seth Rose [D]Rep. Carl Anderson [D]
Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R]Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. Robert Brown [D]Rep. Steven Long [R]
Rep. Dennis Moss [R]Rep. Steve Moss [R]Rep. Doug Gilliam [R]Rep. William Chumley [R]
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R]Rep. Bart Blackwell [R]Rep. Beth Bernstein [D]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]
Rep. Adam Morgan [R]Rep. Kirkman Finlay [R]Rep. Heather Crawford [R]Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D]
Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D]Rep. Ashley Trantham [R]Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D]Rep. Shedron Williams [D]
Rep. McLain Toole [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-07 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-07HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-3
2019-03-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-06HouseRoll call Yeas-113 Nays-4
2019-03-06HouseRead second time
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-03-06HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Williams, Toole
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Trantham, Garvin
2019-03-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2019-02-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay, Crawford
2019-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, V.S.Moss, Gilliam, Chumley, Gagnon, Blackwell, Bernstein, Stavrinakis, Morgan
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown, Long
2019-02-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGinnis, Hardee
2019-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson
2019-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Hosey, Clyburn, Chellis, Kimmons, Rivers, Forrest, Mace, Johnson, Robinson, Dillard, Rose
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bannister, Ridgeway, Atkinson, Bryant, Bales, Alexander, R.Williams, B.Cox, Martin, Jefferson
2019-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler, Kirby, Tallon, Caskey, West, Collins, Forrester, Spires, Thayer, Wooten, Huggins, Willis, Herbkersman, Stringer, Erickson, Bradley, McCravy, Lowe, Clemmons, Davis
2019-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile, Cogswell, Daning, Loftis, Burns
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hyde, Jordan, Bamberg, Ligon
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett, Young, Norrell
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
2019-01-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, Weeks, Hewitt, Bailey, Hixon
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0419 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13240(n/a)See Bill Text
1263800(n/a)See Bill Text
591444(n/a)See Bill Text
591485(n/a)See Bill Text
59101350(n/a)See Bill Text
5910420(n/a)See Bill Text
59111110(n/a)See Bill Text
59111155(n/a)See Bill Text
5914950(n/a)See Bill Text
59150360(n/a)See Bill Text
59155110(n/a)See Bill Text
59155120(n/a)See Bill Text
59155130(n/a)See Bill Text
59155140(n/a)See Bill Text
59155150(n/a)See Bill Text
59155155(n/a)See Bill Text
59155160(n/a)See Bill Text
59155180(n/a)See Bill Text
59156250(n/a)See Bill Text
591715(n/a)See Bill Text
59181950(n/a)See Bill Text
5918310(n/a)See Bill Text
5918320(n/a)See Bill Text
5918325(n/a)See Bill Text
5918365(n/a)See Bill Text
5918920(n/a)See Bill Text
5919350(n/a)See Bill Text
5919360(n/a)See Bill Text
591945(n/a)See Bill Text
591955(n/a)See Bill Text
591960(n/a)See Bill Text
591990(n/a)See Bill Text
592050(n/a)See Bill Text
592525(n/a)See Bill Text
592552(n/a)See Bill Text
5926120(n/a)See Bill Text
592620(n/a)See Bill Text
592635(n/a)See Bill Text
5929250(n/a)See Bill Text
5939100(n/a)See Bill Text
59510(n/a)See Bill Text
59565(n/a)See Bill Text
595330(n/a)See Bill Text
595920(n/a)See Bill Text
5959210(n/a)See Bill Text
595930(n/a)See Bill Text
595950(n/a)See Bill Text
595960(n/a)See Bill Text
5981115(n/a)See Bill Text
813810(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback