SC H4732 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 51-1-100 So As To Require The Department Of Parks, Recreation And Tourism To Undertake Certain Actions To Facilitate The Charging Of Electric Vehicles At All State Welcome Centers; By Adding Section 57-3-800 So As To Require The Department Of Transportation To Undertake Certain Actions To Facilitate The Charging Of Electric Vehicles At All State-operated Rest Areas; And To Require The Attorney General To Request A Waiver From The Federal Provision.
Title
Electric vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Jason Elliott [R] | Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] |
Rep. Seth Rose [D] | Rep. McLain Toole [R] | Rep. Chandra Dillard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard |
2020-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2020-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4732&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4732_20191120.htm |