SC H4705 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Make Technical Corrections
Title
Religious counselors designated as mandated reporters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 222 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 264 | |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-05-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amended |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment General |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |