SC H4697 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Schuessler
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Schuessler
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 12-6-1172 So As To Exempt The Retirement Income Of First Responders, Law Enforcement Officers, And Teachers; And By Amending Section 12-6-1170, Relating To Retirement Income Deduction, So As To Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Income tax deduction
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Kilmartin [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. David O'Neal [R] | Rep. Kathy Landing [R] |
Rep. Joseph Bustos [R] | Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R] | Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Carla Schuessler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Schuessler |
2024-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Landing, Bustos, McGinnis, Hardee |
2024-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: O'Neal |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-12-14 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H5009 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4697&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/4697_20231214.htm |