SC H4678 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge That Crosses Interstate Highway 20 Along Trenholm Road In Richland County "marvin Clifton 'cliff' Moore, Jr. Memorial Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At The Bridge That Contain This Designation.
Title
Marvin Clifton Moore, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-28 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced |