SC H4673 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 56-1-50, Relating To Beginners' Permits, Hours And Conditions Of Vehicle Operation, Renewal And Fees, Drivers' Training Courses, And Eligibility For Full Licensure, So As To Exempt Additional Persons From Obtaining Beginners' Permits Before Operating Motor Vehicles, And To Provide Persons At Least Eighteen Years Old May Take The Driving Test After Maintaining A Beginner's Permit For At Least Thirty Days.
Title
Beginner's permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams, Henegan |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2024-01-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-12-14 | House | Prefiled |