SC H4662 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact The Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact And Related Provisions, Enacted By Sections 1, 2, 3, And 5, Act 339 Of 2008, Which Expired On June 1, 2014, And To Make These Reenacted Provisions Retroactive To This Expiration Date, And To Specifically Not Reenact Certain Obsolete Provisions
Title
Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Act No. 161 | |
2016-04-27 | Effective date 04/21/16 | |
2016-04-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-04-19 | Ratified R 166 | |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |