SC H4611 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Gressette Room 307
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Gressette Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Gressette Room 307
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Gressette Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 50-11-785 So As To Prohibit The Unlawful Removal Or Destruction Of Electronic Collars Or Other Electronic Devices Placed On Dogs By Their Owners And To Provide Penalties.
Title
Unlawful removal of electronic dog-control devices
Sponsors
Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Don Chapman [R] | Rep. Bill Taylor [R] |
Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Gary Brewer [R] | Rep. Robby Robbins [R] | Rep. Gil Gatch [R] |
Rep. Cally Forrest [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-06 | House | Amended |
2024-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brewer, Robbins, Gatch |
2024-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |