SC H4575 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-6-3690 So As To Provide An Income Tax Credit For A Parent Or Guardian Who Teaches A Qualifying Student At Home For Instruction-related Expenses And To Provide The Manner In Which The Credit May Be Claimed.
Title
Home School Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-11-17 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0933 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4575&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/4575_20211117.htm |